VA SB255 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Additional transient occupancy tax in Prince George County. Authorizes Prince George County to impose an additional transient occupancy tax at a rate of up to two percent, for a total maximum rate of seven percent. The revenue from the additional tax shall be used solely for tourism purposes.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; authorizes Prince George County to impose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 27-N) (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB255ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (69-Y 27-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House (69-Y 27-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N 1-A) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101548D |