VA SB254 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; delivery of alcoholic beverages; third-party delivery license; container. Creates a third-party delivery license that authorizes the licensee to deliver alcoholic beverages purchased by consumers from other retail licensees. The bill establishes conditions for the issuance of third-party delivery licenses, imposes eligibility requirements for delivery personnel, and sets forth requirements for a delivery to be made by such delivery personnel. The bill imposes a $2,500 fine for first-time violations of the delivery requirements and a $5,000 fine for second and subsequent violations. The bill also establishes container requirements for certain alcoholic beverages sold for off-premises consumption or delivery. The bill requires that such alcoholic beverages, if not contained in the manufacturer's original sealed container, (i) be enclosed in a container that has no straw holes or other openings and is sealed in a manner that allows a person to readily discern whether the container has been opened or tampered with; (ii) display the name of the licensee from which the alcoholic beverages were purchased; (iii) be clearly marked with the phrase "contains alcoholic beverages"; (iv) have a maximum volume of 16 ounces per beverage for certain beverages; and (v) be stored in the trunk of the vehicle, in an area that is rear of the driver's seat, in a locked container or compartment, or, in the case of delivery by bicycle, in a compartment behind the bicyclist during delivery. The bill also excludes from the rebuttable presumption in current law that a person is consuming alcohol while driving any person who is delivering an alcoholic beverage in accordance with the provisions of the bill. The bill directs the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority to collect data regarding the compliance of third-party delivery licensees with the provisions of the bill and report such data to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by November 1, 2023. The bill extends from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2024, the sunset on prior legislation that allowed certain licensees to sell mixed beverages for off-premises consumption.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; delivery of alcoholic beverages, third-party delivery license.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078) | |
2022-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB254ER) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB254S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Morrissey withdrawn |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104923D-S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104923D-S1 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: ABC |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103941D |
Same As/Similar To
HB426 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
HB426 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
HB426 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 323.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |