VA SB249 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Taxation of all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road motorcycles. Provides that all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road vehicles shall be subject to the motor vehicle sales and use tax but exempt from the retail sales and use tax. Current law provides that such vehicles are subject to the retail sales and use tax but exempt from the motor vehicle sales and use tax. The motor vehicle sales and use tax would be imposed at the same rate as the state and local sales and use tax: at a rate of six percent in Planning Districts 8 and 23 and 5.3 percent in the rest of the state. The revenues collected from the motor vehicle sales tax on all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road vehicles would be distributed in the same manner as the state and local retail sales and use tax. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2018. This bill is identical to HB 1441.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

All-terrain vehicles (ATVs), mopeds, and off-road motorcycles; taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 22-N) (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 840 (effective 10/1/18)
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled bill text (SB249ER2)
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (76-Y 21-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
2018-04-04SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB249ER)
2018-02-28SenateEnrolled
2018-02-26SenateTitle replaced 18107236D-S1
2018-02-26SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2018-02-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 22-N)
2018-02-22HousePassed House with substitute (74-Y 22-N)
2018-02-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB249H1
2018-02-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107236D-H1
2018-02-22HouseRead third time
2018-02-21HouseRead second time
2018-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107236D-H1
2018-02-19HouseReported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
2018-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-29HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-22SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
2018-01-22SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
2018-01-19SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102030D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812401(n/a)See Bill Text
5812402(n/a)See Bill Text
5812403(n/a)See Bill Text
5812425(n/a)See Bill Text
581602(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB249
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB249+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB249H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB249ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB249ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0840+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0011+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0066SB0249+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0081SB0249+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0082SB0249+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0083SB0249+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0120+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0976+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0686SB0249+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1226SB0249+SB0249
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1665+SB0249

Bill Comments

feedback