VA SB246 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance agents; licensing requirements. Removes prospectively the exemption from examination requirements for individuals who have been awarded the Chartered Property and Casualty Underwriter and Chartered Life Underwriter designations. Insurance agent licenses that were granted to individuals who qualified for the designation exemptions will remain valid unless and until their licenses are otherwise terminated. The measure also (i) requires licensed resident public adjuster entities to meet the same bonding requirements as resident public adjusters, nonresident public adjusters, and nonresident public adjuster entities and (ii) adds manager, member, or partner to those individuals or entities that may be considered a designated licensed producer for an agency.
Title
Insurance agents; licensing requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 131 (effective - 7/1/2018) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB246ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101279D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1817 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1820 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1838 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1845.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1845.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1857.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1865.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |