VA SB245 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Health Professions; conversion therapy prohibited. Prohibits any health care provider or person who performs counseling as part of his training for any profession licensed by a regulatory board of the Department of Health Professions from engaging in conversion therapy, as defined in the bill, with any person under 18 years of age and provides that such counseling constitutes unprofessional conduct and is grounds for disciplinary action. The bill provides that no state funds shall be expended for the purpose of conducting conversion therapy with a person under 18 years of age, referring a person under 18 years of age for conversion therapy, or extending health benefits coverage for conversion therapy with a person under 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conversion therapy; prohibited by certain health care providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-21SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2020-01-21SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (20-Y 18-N)
2020-01-20SenatePrinted as engrossed 20101090D-E
2020-01-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB245E
2020-01-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-20SenateRead second time
2020-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
2020-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101090D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412409.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback