VA SB24 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eviction Diversion Pilot Program; expiration; report. Extends from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2024, the expiration date of the Eviction Diversion Pilot Program. The bill also requires the Virginia Housing Commission to submit an interim report no later than November 30, 2022, and a final report no later November 30, 2023. Eviction Diversion Pilot Program; expiration; report. Extends from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2024, the expiration date of the Eviction Diversion Pilot Program. The bill also requires the Virginia Housing Commission to submit an interim report no later than November 30, 2022, and a final report no later November 30, 2023.
Title
Eviction Diversion Pilot Program; extends sunset date, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797) | |
2022-05-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB24ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103351D |