VA SB237 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; mileage-based user fee program; protection of data. Prohibits the disclosure of certain data necessary for the administration of the mileage-based user fee program and authorizes participants in the mileage-based user fee program to participate without location tracking. Department of Motor Vehicles; mileage-based user fee program; protection of data. Prohibits the disclosure of certain data necessary for the administration of the mileage-based user fee program and authorizes participants in the mileage-based user fee program to participate without location tracking.
Title
Mileage-based user fee program; protection of data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 236 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB237ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB237S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105348D-S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105348D-S1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104151D |