VA SB232 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Menstrual supplies; availability; public elementary, middle, and high schools. Requires each school board to make tampons or pads available, at all times and at no cost to students, (i) in such accessible locations as it deems appropriate in each elementary school in the local school division and (ii) in the bathrooms of each middle school and high school in the local school division.
Title
Menstrual supplies; school boards shall make available in each school building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (59-Y 35-N) (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (59-Y 35-N) (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 676 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB232ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (59-Y 35-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (59-Y 35-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109505D-S1 |
2020-03-03 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-28 | House | Delegates: Keam, Tyler, Avoli |
2020-02-28 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Boysko, Hashmi, McClellan |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (54-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB232H1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108276D-H1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108276D-H1 |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102670D-E |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB232E |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102670D |
Same As/Similar To
HB405 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)