VA SB231 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; amend waivers providing services for individuals with developmental disabilities; greater financial flexibility for certain services; report. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services (the Department) to take steps to amend the Family and Individual Supports, Community Living, Building Independence, and Commonwealth Coordinated Plus waivers. The bill requires the Department to report on its progress to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022. Department of Medical Assistance Services; amend waivers providing services for individuals with developmental disabilities; greater financial flexibility for certain services; report. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services (the Department) to take steps to amend the Family and Individual Supports, Community Living, Building Independence, and Commonwealth Coordinated Plus waivers. The bill requires the Department to report on its progress to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Title
Individuals w/developmental disabilities; DMAS to amend waivers providing services, regulation, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB231S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105810D-S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105810D-S1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103837D |