VA SB227 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

New College Institute; powers and duties of board. Requires the board of directors of the New College Institute to seek opportunities to collaborate with local comprehensive community colleges to meet specialized noncredit workforce training needs identified by industry. However, if the local comprehensive community colleges are unable to meet such needs, the board may seek to collaborate with other education providers or other public or private organizations to provide specialized noncredit workforce training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New College Institute; powers and duties of board of directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB227ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House (95-Y 2-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseReported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-18HouseRead first time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-01-16SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-11SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101868D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2313113(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB227
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB227+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB227ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0754+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0003+SB0227
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0015SB0227+SB0227
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0038SB0227+SB0227
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0040SB0227+SB0227
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0041SB0227+SB0227
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0903V0043+SB0227
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0169+SB0227
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1339+SB0227

Bill Comments

feedback