VA SB22 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
American Revolution 250 Commission; membership. Adds five legislative members to the American Revolution 250 Commission.
Title
American Revolution 250 Commission; adds five legislative members to the Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 685 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB22ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101361D |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
HB6 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
HB6 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)