VA SB218 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recycling; beneficial use. Defines "beneficial use," "beneficiation facility," and "recycling center" and provides that a beneficiation facility or recycling center shall be considered a manufacturer for the purpose of any state or local economic development incentive grant. The bill directs the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) to encourage and support beneficial use; current law requires the Department to encourage and support litter control and recycling. The bill also directs the Department to provide to the General Assembly by November 1, 2019, an evaluation of Virginia's solid waste recycling rates and a set of recommendations for improving the reliability of the supply of recycled materials during the next 10 years in order to provide for beneficial use.
Title
Recycling; clarifies definitions of beneficial use and recycling center, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 615 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB218ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-03-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB218S1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18104926D-S1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18104926D-S1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103185D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1422 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1422.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |