VA SB216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; catastrophic health plans. Authorizes health carriers to offer catastrophic plans on the individual market and to offer such plans to all individuals. The measure provides that a catastrophic plan is deemed to provide an essential health benefits package and to meet certain requirements of federal law. A catastrophic plan is a high-deductible health care plan that provides essential health benefits and coverage for at least three primary care visits per policy year. Under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, as amended, catastrophic plans satisfy requirements that health benefit plans provide minimum levels of coverage only if they cover individuals who are younger than 30 years of age or who qualify for a hardship exemption or affordability exemption. The measure requires the Commissioner of Insurance to apply to the federal government for a state innovation waiver allowing the implementation of the provision allowing catastrophic plans to be offered on the individual market to all individuals. The provision will become effective 30 days after the Commissioner notifies certain persons that the request has been approved.
Title
Health insurance; catastrophic health plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 7-N) |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102858D |