VA SB216 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Parole; limitation on the application of parole statutes; exception. Provides that an incarcerated person who was sentenced by a jury prior to June 9, 2000 for a felony that is not a violent offense is eligible for parole if the offense was committed on or after January 1, 1995 and prior to June 9, 2000 and the jury was not instructed on the abolition of parole. June 9, 2000 is the date of the Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Fishback v. Commonwealth, 260 Va. 104, in which the Court held that a jury should be instructed on the fact that parole has been abolished.
Title
Parole; limitation on the application of parole statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB216S1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105442D-S1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105442D-S1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103117D |