VA SB215 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Review of death of inmates in local correctional facilities; report. Provides that the Board of Corrections shall publish, on its website, an annual report summarizing the jail death reviews conducted by the Board within that year. The bill provides that such report shall include any trends or similarities among the deaths of inmates in local correctional facilities and present recommendations on policy changes to reduce the number of deaths in local correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inmates; review of death in local correctional facilities, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendments specific and severable (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1287)
2020-05-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1287 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 22, 2020
2020-04-22SenateCommunicated to Governor
2020-04-22SenatePassed by for the day
2020-04-22SenateAmendments specific and severable (20-Y 19-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's substitute printed 20110070D-S1
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB215ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-03-05SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-03-05HouseRead third time
2020-03-04HouseRead second time
2020-03-02HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-19HouseRead first time
2020-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 20101821D-E
2020-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB215E
2020-01-28SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-28SenateRead second time
2020-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
2019-12-30SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-12-30SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101821D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53169.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB215&201+sum+SB215
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB215+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB215E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB215ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB215S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1287+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0044+SB0215
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0184SB0215+SB0215
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0225SB0215+SB0215
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0207+SB0215
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0416+SB0215
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1631SB0215+SB0215
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2017+SB0215
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1966SB0215+SB0215

Bill Comments

feedback