VA SB212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; United States Navy; Navy-Marine Corps Relief Society Fund. Authorizes the issuance of revenue-sharing special license plates with a design that incorporates the emblem of the United States Navy to active members and certain veterans of the United States Navy. The bill provides that unremarried surviving spouses of such service members may also be issued such special license plates. The bill creates the Navy-Marine Corps Relief Society Fund to utilize funds from the license plate fees to support the Navy-Marine Corps Relief Society in Virginia.
Title
License plates, special; issuance to members of United States Navy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 107 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB212ER) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104084D |