VA SB207 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase of service handguns or other weapons by retired sworn law-enforcement officers. Removes the requirement that a sworn law-enforcement officer be employed in a full-time capacity at the time of his retirement to purchase his service handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retired sworn law-enforcement officers; purchase of service handguns or other weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseLeft in Public Safety
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateReported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-12-30SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-12-30SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101711D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591148.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback