VA SB203 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; Standards of Learning assessments. Reduces the total number and type of required Standards of Learning assessments to the minimum requirements established by the federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965. The bill requires the Board of Education to adopt and implement a transition plan over two years beginning with the 2017-2018 school year.
Title
Public schools; Standards of Learning assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB525 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB498 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB441 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to Web only 16105139D-S1 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101468D |