VA SB203 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; opening of the school year. Allows local school boards, for years in which Labor Day falls on September 5 or later, to set the school calendar so that the first day students are required to attend school shall be no earlier than one week before Labor Day.
Title
School calendar; local school boards to set first day of school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Rereferred to Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (22-Y 18-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103423D |