VA SB200 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exclusions; administrative investigations; onsite sewage complaints. Creates an exemption with respect to the Virginia Freedom of Information Act for records of active investigations and the names, addresses, and telephone numbers of complainants furnished in confidence with respect to an active investigation of onsite sewage complaints made to the Department of Health or the Department of Environmental Quality. Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exclusions; administrative investigations; onsite sewage complaints. Creates an exemption with respect to the Virginia Freedom of Information Act for records of active investigations and the names, addresses, and telephone numbers of complainants furnished in confidence with respect to an active investigation of onsite sewage complaints made to the Department of Health or the Department of Environmental Quality.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exclusions, administrative investigations, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22101761D-E |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB200E |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101761D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 163.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |