VA SB200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax credits for housing choice vouchers; eligible housing areas. Expands the definition of "eligible housing area" for purposes of the housing choice voucher tax credit to include the Washington-Arlington-Alexandria Metropolitan Statistical Area. Landlords who rent qualified housing units within such areas are eligible for an income tax credit. Current law only applies to certain areas within the Richmond Metropolitan Statistical Area and the Virginia Beach-Norfolk-Newport News Metropolitan Statistical Area.
Title
Income tax, state; housing choice vouchers, definition of eligible housing areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N) (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N) (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1032) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1032 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB200ER) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-25 | House | Delegates: Guzman, Watts, Ware |
2020-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Barker, McClellan, Vogel |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendment (59-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB200S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106812D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106812D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102465D |