VA SB20 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Planning and Budget; regulatory reduction pilot program; report. Directs the Department of Planning and Budget (the Department), under the supervision of the Secretary of Finance (the Secretary), to administer a three-year regulatory reduction pilot program aimed at reducing by 25 percent the regulations and regulatory requirements, as defined in the bill, of the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation and the Department of Criminal Justice Services by July 1, 2021. The bill requires the Secretary to report annually to the Speaker of the House and the Chairman of the Senate Rules Committee no later than October 1, 2019, and October 1, 2020, on the progress of the regulatory reduction pilot program. The bill also requires the Secretary to report by August 15, 2021, to the Speaker of the House and the Chairman of the Senate Rules Committee (i) the progress towards identifying the 25 percent reduction goal, (ii) recommendations for expanding the program to other agencies, and (iii) any additional information the Secretary determines may be helpful to support the General Assembly's regulatory reduction and reform efforts. The bill provides that if, by October 1, 2021, the program has achieved less than a 25 percent total reduction in regulations and regulatory requirements across both pilot agencies, the Secretary shall report on the feasibility and effectiveness of implementing a 2-for-1 regulatory budget providing that for every one new regulatory requirement, two existing regulatory requirements of equivalent or greater burden must be streamlined, repealed, or replaced for a period not to exceed three years. Lastly, the bill directs all executive branch agencies subject to the Administrative Process Act (ยง 2.2-4000 et seq.) to develop a baseline regulatory catalog and report such catalog data to the Department, which shall then track and report on the extent to which agencies comply with existing requirements to periodically review all regulations every four years. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory reduction pilot program; Department of Planning and Budget to implement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB20S1
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106556D-S1
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106556D-S1
2018-02-09SenateReported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100264D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222537(n/a)See Bill Text
222545(n/a)See Bill Text
224011(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback