VA SB20 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Patient-Centered Medical Home Advisory Council. Establishes the Patient-Centered Medical Home Advisory Council (Council) as an advisory council in the executive branch. The bill requires the Council to advise and make recommendations to the Department of Medical Assistance Services on reforms to the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance that would increase the quality of care while containing costs through a patient-centered medical home system. The bill defines a patient-centered medical home as a team approach to providing health care that (i) originates in a primary care setting; (ii) fosters a partnership among the patient, the personal provider and other health care professionals, and, where appropriate, the patient's family; (iii) utilizes the partnership to access all medical and nonmedical health-related services needed by the patient to achieve maximum health potential; and (iv) maintains a centralized, comprehensive record of all health-related services to promote continuity of care.
Title
Patient-Centered Medical Home Advisory Council; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100389D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 331.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 331.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 331.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |