VA SB2 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase, possession, sale, transfer, etc., of assault firearms and certain ammunition feeding devices prohibited; penalty. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person who imports, sells, manufactures, purchases, possesses, transports, or transfers an assault firearm, as that term is defined in the bill, and prohibits a person who has been convicted of such violation from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm for a period of three years from the date of conviction. The bill provides that an assault firearm does not include any firearm that is an antique firearm, has been rendered permanently inoperable, is manually operated by bolt, pump, lever, or slide action, or was manufactured before July 1, 2024. The bill also prohibits the sale of a large capacity ammunition feeding device, as that term is defined in the bill. The bill provides that any person who willfully and intentionally (i) sells an assault firearm to another person or (ii) purchases an assault firearm from another person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and that any person who imports, sells, barters, or transfers a large capacity ammunition feeding device is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person younger than 21 years of age to import, sell, manufacture, purchase, possess, transport, or transfer an assault firearm regardless of the date of manufacture of such assault firearm. Purchase, possession, sale, transfer, etc., of assault firearms and certain ammunition feeding devices prohibited; penalty. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person who imports, sells, manufactures, purchases, possesses, transports, or transfers an assault firearm, as that term is defined in the bill, and prohibits a person who has been convicted of such violation from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm for a period of three years from the date of conviction. The bill provides that an assault firearm does not include any firearm that is an antique firearm, has been rendered permanently inoperable, is manually operated by bolt, pump, lever, or slide action, or was manufactured before July 1, 2024. The bill also prohibits the sale of a large capacity ammunition feeding device, as that term is defined in the bill. The bill provides that any person who willfully and intentionally (i) sells an assault firearm to another person or (ii) purchases an assault firearm from another person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and that any person who imports, sells, barters, or transfers a large capacity ammunition feeding device is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person younger than 21 years of age to import, sell, manufacture, purchase, possess, transport, or transfer an assault firearm regardless of the date of manufacture of such assault firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault firearms & certain ammunition, etc.; purchase, possession, sale, transfer, etc., prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
2024-02-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2024-02-20HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2024-02-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 24107815D-H1
2024-02-16HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2024-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2024-02-13HouseRead first time
2024-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2024-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2024-02-07SenatePending question, not ordered (18-Y 22-N)
2024-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2024-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 24100411D-E
2024-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB2E
2024-02-05SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2024-02-05SenateReading of amendments waived
2024-02-05SenateRead second time
2024-02-02SenatePassed by for the day
2024-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2024-01-31SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (10-Y 5-N)
2024-01-22SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2024-01-22SenateReported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
2024-01-10SenateMoved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name
2023-11-20SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100411D

Same As/Similar To

HB2 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152915.5(n/a)See Bill Text
182287.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182287.4:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:9(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:5(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.7(n/a)See Bill Text
182309.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+SB2
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB2E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB2H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24106550A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB2AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24107815D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB2F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB2F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB2FE160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB2FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB2FH1160+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S13V0035+SB0002
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S05V0082+SB0002
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0184SB0002+SB0002
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0265SB0002+SB0002
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0266SB0002+SB0002
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H15V0096+SB0002
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H02V0268+SB0002

Bill Comments

feedback