VA SB191 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Net energy metering; eligibility limits. Increases the cap on the amount of capacity a renewable electric generating facility in an area served by an investor-owned electric utility may have and remain eligible to participate in the net energy metering program. The measure increases such a facility's capacity from the expected annual energy consumption to 125 percent of that consumption based on billing history. In areas served by electric cooperatives, a facility is ineligible to participate in a net energy metering program if its capacity exceeds expected annual energy consumption. If the building to be served by the generating facility is newly constructed, the expected annual energy consumption is based on annual energy consumption at similar buildings. The measure also provides that net metering periods run from June 1 through May 30 and provides that excess generation shall be purchased at a wholesale price determined in accordance with regulations of the State Corporation Commission.
Title
Net energy metering; eligibility limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB191S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106596D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106596D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102658D |