VA SB188 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; competitive negotiation for professional services. Provides that for competitive negotiation for professional services, except in the case of the procurement of architectural or engineering services, a public body may conduct negotiations simultaneously with the top two ranked offerors if the public body does not request or discuss nonbinding estimates of total project costs at the discussion stage and as long as such process is set forth in the Request for Proposal.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; competitive negotiation for professional services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18102579D-E |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB188E |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102579D |