VA SB185 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0846)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0846)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing homes, assisted living facilities, hospice programs, and hospice facilities; possession and administration of cannabidiol or THC-A oil. Allows nursing home, assisted living facility, hospice program, and hospice facility employees and staff members who are authorized to possess, distribute, or administer medications to residents to store, dispense, or administer cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil to a resident who has been issued a valid written certification for such medication.
Title
Nursing homes, hospices, etc.; possession and administration of cannabidiol or THC-A.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0846) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 846 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB185ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB185S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105723D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105723D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2019-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103901D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 251.1:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1803.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |