VA SB181 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; commercial lifestyle center; definition. Reduces from 25 to 10 the minimum number of acres upon which a commercial development must sit in order to qualify for licensure as a commercial lifestyle center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; commercial lifestyle center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-10SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-12-21SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-12-21SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103420D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41100(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback