VA SB18 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates (i) to supporters of the Virginia Kids Eat Free program, (ii) to supporters of the Professor Garfield Foundation, (iii) bearing the legend: TRUST WOMEN/RESPECT CHOICE, (iv) bearing the legend: BUY LOCAL, (v) to supporters of the Virginia Recycling Association, (vi) to supporters of the Washington Capitals hockey team, and (vii) bearing the legend: FRIENDS OF COAL. This bill incorporates
Title
License plates, special; issuance to supporters of Virginia Kids Eat Free program, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Houck [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Yvonne Miller [D] |
Sen. Patricia Ticer [D] | Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (78-Y 7-N) (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (64-Y 30-N) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (13-Y 22-N) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 61 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 8-N) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (64-Y 30-N) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (13-Y 22-N) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 61 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 8-N) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB18ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (78-Y 7-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (78-Y 7-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB18ER) | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-13 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (64-Y 30-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (64-Y 30-N) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Delegates: May, Cosgrove, Brink | |
2010-03-10 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Senators: Lucas, Deeds, Wagner, Ticer | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2010-03-05 | House: House insisted on substitute with amendment | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (13-Y 22-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House with substitute with amendment (81-Y 15-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB18H1 | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (59-Y 40-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Amendment by Delegate Gilbert agreed to (59-Y 40-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105575D-H1 | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105575D-H1 | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 6-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 8-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB18S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Obenshain rejected | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105254D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105254D-S1 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (7-Y 5-N) | |
2009-12-23 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2009-12-23 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101116D |
Same As/Similar To
SB37 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB168 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB453 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB704 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB709 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB168 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB453 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB704 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)
SB709 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (SB18-Lucas) (11-Y 3-N)