VA SB1777 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Corrections; restrictive housing; data collection and reporting; report. Requires the Department of Corrections to report to the General Assembly and the Governor on or before October 1 of each year certain population statistics of persons incarcerated in state correctional institutions, including certain statistics regarding offenders placed in and released from restrictive housing and Shared Allied Management Units. This bill incorporates SB 1085 and SB 1140 and is identical to HB 1642.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrictive housing; data collection and reporting, Department of Corrections to submit report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 516 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1777ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107692D-S3
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Adams, L.R., Watts
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Saslaw, Favola, Black
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1777H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19107250D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19107250D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19106145D-ES2
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment SB1777ES2
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator Saslaw agreed to 19106145D-S2
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateRecommitted to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-30SenateMotion to recommit to committee agreed to
2019-01-30SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-30SenateFloor substitute printed 19106145D-S2 (Saslaw)
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19105898D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-30SenateRead second time
2019-01-29SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateIncorporates SB1140 (Favola)
2019-01-25SenateIncorporates SB1085 (Marsden)
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105898D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104218D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53139.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1777
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1777+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1777S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1777S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1777ES2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1777H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1777S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1777ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0516+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0028+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0215SB1777+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0062+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1777+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0349SB1777+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0164+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0360+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3140+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0951SB1777+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1777+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1099SB1777+SB1777
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3355+SB1777

Bill Comments

feedback