VA SB1772 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Restraint of pregnant offenders. Requires the Board of Corrections to review its standards related to allowable restraint practices for pregnant prisoners to ensure that (i) pregnant prisoners are treated humanely and restrained in a manner that accounts for their specific health needs and (ii) such restraint procedures provide adequate protection for the safety of correctional staff and others who may be in close proximity to such prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pregnant prisoners; use of restraint.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1772ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1772S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106334D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106334D-S1
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19103986D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53136.1(n/a)See Bill Text
53170.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1772
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1772+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1772S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1772ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0059+SB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1772+SB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1772+SB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1772+SB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0023+SB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0051+SB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2969+SB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3012+SB1772

Bill Comments

feedback