VA SB1768 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Use of handheld personal communications devices; highway work zones; penalty. Prohibits any person from holding a handheld personal communications device in his hand while driving a motor vehicle in a highway work zone, with certain exceptions. The bill provides that a violation is punishable by a mandatory fine of $250. Current law prohibits only the reading of an email or text message on the device and manually entering letters or text in the device as a means of communicating, with the same exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handheld personal communications devices; use while driving, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 4-N) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 20-N) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
2019-04-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 849 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03SenateCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseSpeaker ruled Governor's recommendation s not germane
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 3-N)
2019-04-03SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 4-N)
2019-03-26SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1768ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 20-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (77-Y 20-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Collins, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Stuart, Chafin, Obenshain
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N 1-A)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute (82-Y 16-N 1-A)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1768H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106921D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106921D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-07HouseReferred from Transportation by voice vote
2019-02-06HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1768S1
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106291D-S1
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106291D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2019-01-23SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2019-01-23SenateRereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104680D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621078.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1768
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1768+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1768S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1768H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1768ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0849+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0030+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0189+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0355SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0383SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0148+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0353+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3155+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0957SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1096SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3354+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1150SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1151SB1768+SB1768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1149SB1768+SB1768

Bill Comments

feedback