VA SB1751 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation. Permits the Director of DPOR, or his designee, to issue a notice to any person unlawfully engaging in unlicensed practice of an occupation to cease and desist such activity. The bill also provides that following the close of any biennium, when the account for any regulatory board within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation shows that unspent and unencumbered revenue exceeds 20 percent or $100,000 of the total expenses allocated to the regulatory board for the past biennium, whichever is greater, the regulatory board must (i) distribute all such excess revenue to current regulants of the board and (ii) reduce the fees levied by it for certification, licensure, registration, or permit and renewal thereof so that the fees are sufficient but not excessive to cover expenses. Under current law, these boards are required to adjust their fees when their account shows expenses allocated to it for the past biennium to be more than 10 percent greater or less than moneys collected on behalf of the board. Current law does not require the boards to distribute excess funds to regulants. The provisions of the bill requiring the distribution of excess revenue and the reduction of fees have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; licensing, regulatory boards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 517 (effective - see bill)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1751ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateTitle replaced 19106600D-H1
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1751H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106600D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106600D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1751S1
2019-01-31SenateSubstitute by Senator Ruff agreed to 19106057D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateFloor substitute printed 19106057D-S1 (Ruff)
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19105148D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
541111(n/a)See Bill Text
541113(n/a)See Bill Text
5411144(n/a)See Bill Text
5411145(n/a)See Bill Text
5411146(n/a)See Bill Text
5412346(n/a)See Bill Text
5412347(n/a)See Bill Text
5412349(n/a)See Bill Text
5412353(n/a)See Bill Text
5412354(n/a)See Bill Text
5412355(n/a)See Bill Text
5412358(n/a)See Bill Text
541304(n/a)See Bill Text
541500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1751
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1751+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1751S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1751H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1751ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0517+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0092+SB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1751+SB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0279SB1751+SB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0243+SB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2779+SB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0614SB1751+SB1751

Bill Comments

feedback