VA SB1742 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Participation in the state retiree health benefits program. Creates an exception to the law that if a state retiree elects to participate in the state retiree health plan, but later discontinues participation, he is barred from future participation. The bill would allow a state retiree to discontinue participation, but later return to the plan, if the discontinuation was due to employment with the federal government and participation in a federal employee health benefit program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State retiree health benefits program; amends provision relating to participation in program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104581D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1742E
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104581D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5111405(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback