VA SB1729 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; payment of claims. Prohibits a health care provider from submitting a claim to the Workers' Compensation Commission seeking additional payment for medical services rendered to a claimant before July 1, 2014, if the health care provider has previously accepted payment for the same medical services pursuant to the federal Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Act. The measure prohibits the Commission from adjudicating any such claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; payment of claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 760 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1729ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 19103721D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652605.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1729
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1729+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1729ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0760+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0054+SB1729
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1729+SB1729
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1729+SB1729
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1729+SB1729
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1729+SB1729
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0180+SB1729
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2742+SB1729

Bill Comments

feedback