VA SB1718 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Education; reading diagnostic tools; report. Directs the Department of Education (the Department) to consult with stakeholders and develop a plan to implement a pilot program to incorporate additional diagnostic tools into reading diagnostic tests used for screening students in kindergarten through grade three. The bill directs the Department to submit such plan to the General Assembly by December 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reading diagnostic tools; Department of Education to develop and submit plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1718ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateTitle replaced 19106951D-H1
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1718H1
2019-02-21HouseAmendment by Delegate Landes agreed to
2019-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106951D-H1
2019-02-21HouseRead third time
2019-02-20HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106951D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseReported from Education (18-Y 4-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (31-Y 7-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1718S1
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106130D-S1
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106130D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
2019-01-23SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104294D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1718
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1718+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1718S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1718H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1718ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0770+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0147+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1718+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0355SB1718+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0379SB1718+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0034+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0153+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0203V0035+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0200+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3197+SB1718
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0984SB1718+SB1718

Bill Comments

feedback