VA SB1716 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Interstate 81; Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Fund. Creates the Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Fund. Any revenues deposited in the Fund would be allocated for improvements to the Interstate 81 Corridor. The bill also directs the Commonwealth Transportation Board (Board) would develop and update, in consultation with an Interstate 81 Committee (Committee) established by the bill, to develop an Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Program. The Committee is also directed to review the Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Plan adopted by the Board in December, 2018, as it relates to funding options and make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding funding recommendations and prioritization of projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate 81; Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Fund created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseDelegates: Landes, Gilbert, Carr
2019-02-13HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-13SenateSenators: Carrico, Obenshain, Edwards
2019-02-13SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-13SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1716H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106780D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106780D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 2-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1716S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106289D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106289D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 1-N 3-A)
2019-01-23SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-23SenateRereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 19102261D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3323600(n/a)See Bill Text
3323611(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1716
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1716+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1716S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1716H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0031+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0232+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1716+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0436SB1716+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0418SB1716+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0105+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0613SB1716+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0624SB1716+SB1716
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2739+SB1716

Bill Comments

feedback