VA SB1715 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 1/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Sales and use tax; reduced rate on essential personal hygiene products. Applies the reduced state sales and use tax rate of 1.5%, which under current law applies only to food purchased for human consumption, to essential personal hygiene products, defined in the bill as (i) nondurable incontinence products such as diapers, disposable undergarments, pads, and bed sheets; and (ii) menstrual cups and pads, pantyliners, sanitary napkins, tampons, and other products used to absorb or contain menstrual flow. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020. This bill is identical to HB 2540.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax; reduced rate on essential personal hygiene products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 1/1/20)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1715ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-13HouseDelegates: Byron, Ransone, Kory
2019-02-13HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-13SenateSenators: Boysko, Howell, Dunnavant
2019-02-13SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-13SenateSenate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
2019-02-12HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-12HousePassed House with substitute Block Vote (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1715H1
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106474D-H1
2019-02-12HouseRead third time
2019-02-11HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106474D-H1
2019-02-06HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104566D-E
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1715E
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-25SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-25SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 1-N 1-A)
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104566D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581609.10(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1715
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1715+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1715E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1715H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1715ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0094+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0112+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1715+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0223SB1715+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0172+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2671+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0612SB1715+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0623SB1715+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1080SB1715+SB1715
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3352+SB1715

Bill Comments

feedback