VA SB1710 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Community work in lieu of payment of fines and court costs; authority of the court. Clarifies that a court shall oversee a program allowing community service in lieu of payment of fines and court costs, including the monitoring of credit earned toward the discharge of such fine or costs for a period of up to 10 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community work in lieu of payment of fines and court costs; authority of the court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 19103501D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192354(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback