VA SB170 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonsuits; tolling of limitations; contractual limitation periods. Provides that a voluntary nonsuit tolls both a contractual limitation period and a statutorily governed limitation period.
Title
Nonsuits; tolling of limitations, contractual limitation periods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB170ER) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100403D |
Same As/Similar To
HB441 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189)