VA SB1694 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Qualified mental health professionals. Requires the Board of Counseling to promulgate regulations for the registration of persons receiving supervised training in order to qualify as a qualified mental health professional. The bill defines the terms "qualified mental health professional-adult," "qualified mental health professional-child," and "qualified mental health professional-trainee." This bill is identical to HB 2693.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualified mental health professionals; regulations for registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1694ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-14SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104115D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412400.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413500(n/a)See Bill Text
5413505(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback