VA SB169 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensed practical nurses; authority to pronounce death. Extends to licensed practical nurses the authority to pronounce the death of a patient in hospice, provided that certain conditions are met. Current law provides that physicians, registered nurses, and physician assistants may pronounce death. Licensed practical nurses; authority to pronounce death. Extends to licensed practical nurses the authority to pronounce the death of a patient in hospice, provided that certain conditions are met. Current law provides that physicians, registered nurses, and physician assistants may pronounce death.
Title
Practical nurses, licensed; authority to pronounce death for a patient in hospice, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB169ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed House (61-Y 38-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22102397D-E |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB169E |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102397D |