VA SB1688 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; public institutions of higher education; disclosure required by certain offerors; penalty. Requires every offeror who submits a proposal to a public institution of higher education for any construction project that (i) has a total cost of $5 million or more and (ii) uses a procurement method other than competitive sealed bidding to disclose any contributions the offeror or any affiliated entity, or any of their respective officers, directors, managers, or members, has made within the previous five-year period to the public institution of higher education or any private foundation that exists solely to support the public institution of higher education. Any person that knowingly fails to submit such required disclosure is subject to a civil penalty of $500 and is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Va. Public Procurement Act; higher educational public institutions, disclosure of gifts, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106870D-H1 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103981D-E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1688E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103981D |