VA SB1681 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of General Services; surplus property; opportunity for economic development entities to purchase prior to public sale. Provides that prior to offering surplus property for sale to the public, the Department of General Services (the Department) shall notify the chief administrative officer of the locality within which the property is located as well as any economic development entity for such locality of the pending disposition of such property. The bill provides that the chief administrative officer or local economic development entity shall have up to 180 days from the date of such notification to submit a proposal to the Department for the use by the locality or the local economic development entity of such property in conjunction with a bona fide economic development activity. The bill requires the Department to review such proposal and provides that if the Department determines that such proposal is viable and could benefit the Commonwealth, the Department may negotiate with the chief administrative officer or the local economic development entity for the sale of such property to the locality or economic development entity. This bill is identical to HB 2182.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DGS; surplus property, opportunity for economic development entities to purchase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1681ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateTitle replaced 19106536D-H1
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute (98-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1681H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106536D-H1
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106536D-H1
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1681S1
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105920D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105920D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-11SenatePresented and ordered printed 19103959D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011122(n/a)See Bill Text
221130(n/a)See Bill Text
221153(n/a)See Bill Text
221156(n/a)See Bill Text
221157(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1681
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1681+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1681S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1681H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1681ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0660+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0083+SB1681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0186+SB1681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1681+SB1681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1681+SB1681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0279+SB1681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3034+SB1681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0881SB1681+SB1681

Bill Comments

feedback