VA SB1679 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Family First Prevention Services Act; statutory alignment. Aligns the Code of Virginia with the Family First Prevention Services Act of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family First Prevention Services Act; statutory alignment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 688 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1679ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-11SenatePresented and ordered printed 19103899D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161228(n/a)See Bill Text
161281(n/a)See Bill Text
161282.2(n/a)See Bill Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text
632906.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1679
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1679+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1679ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0688+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0018+SB1679
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0150+SB1679
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1679+SB1679
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1679+SB1679
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0133+SB1679
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0193+SB1679
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2735+SB1679

Bill Comments

feedback