VA SB1675 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Killing or injuring police animals; penalty. Requires a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment of six months for any person who maliciously kills or injures an animal owned, used, or trained by a law-enforcement agency, regional jail, or the Department of Corrections while such animal is performing its lawful duties or is being kept in a kennel, pen, or stable while off duty. The bill also provides that such punishment shall be separate and apart from, and shall be made to run consecutively with, any other sentence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police animals; killing or injuring, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 50-N) (Y: 47 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03SenateCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 50-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (47-Y 50-N)
2019-04-03SenateChair votes Yes
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (19-Y 19-N)
2019-04-03SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 18-N)
2019-03-26SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1675ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House (91-Y 7-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2019-01-21SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N)
2019-01-11SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-11SenatePresented and ordered printed 19103633D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182144.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1675
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1675+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1675ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0084+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1675+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0131SB1675+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0150+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0350+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3154+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1145SB1675+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1147SB1675+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1148SB1675+SB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3438+SB1675

Bill Comments

feedback