VA SB1669 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sex Trafficking Response Coordinator; duties; report. Creates, within the Department of Criminal Justice Services, a Sex Trafficking Response Coordinator (the Coordinator) who shall (i) create a statewide plan for local and state agencies to identify and respond to victims of sex trafficking; (ii) coordinate the development of standards and guidelines for treatment programs for victims of sex trafficking; (iii) maintain a list of programs that provide treatment or specialized services to victims of sex trafficking and make such list available to law-enforcement agencies, attorneys for the Commonwealth, crime victim and witness assistance programs, the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Department of Social Services, the Department of Education, and school divisions; (iv) oversee the development of a curriculum to be completed by persons convicted of solicitation of prostitution; and (v) promote strategies for the awareness of sex trafficking, for education and training related to sex trafficking, and for the reduction of demand for commercial sex. The bill requires the Coordinator to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly and include a summary of activities for the year and any recommendations to address sex trafficking within the Commonwealth. The bill as introduced was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to HB 2576.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex Trafficking Response Coordinator; establishes position, duties, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1669ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104154D-E
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1669E
2019-02-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-10SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104154D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91116.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1669
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1669+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1669E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1669ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0514+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0118+SB1669
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0262+SB1669
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1669+SB1669
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1669+SB1669
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1669+SB1669
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0187+SB1669
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2734+SB1669
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0700SB1669+SB1669

Bill Comments

feedback