VA SB1668 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; Sunday store hours; distiller commission. Requires the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority) to pay a distiller who operates a government store on the distiller's licensed premises a commission of not less than 20 percent of the retail price of any goods sold. The bill also allows certain government stores, as determined by the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Authority, to be open on Sundays for the sale of alcoholic beverages after 10:00 a.m. Finally, the bill grants the Board the power to employ or retain in-house legal counsel to advise or represent the Authority in hearings, controversies, or other matters involving the interests of the Authority. The bill provides, however, that upon request by the Board, the Attorney General shall provide legal services for the Authority in accordance with current law. This bill is identical to HB 1770.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; Sunday store hours, distiller commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
2019-03-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1668ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 19-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (79-Y 19-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference substitute printed 19107298D-S1
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-13HouseDelegates: Knight, Peace, Aird
2019-02-13HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-13SenateSenators: Reeves, Mason, Norment
2019-02-13SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-13SenateSenate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (80-Y 17-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1668H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106534D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106534D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 2-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2019-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance (12-Y 4-N)
2019-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N)
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-10SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104334D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41119(n/a)See Bill Text
41120(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1668
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1668+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1668H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1668S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1668ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0811+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0019+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0170+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1668+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0337SB1668+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0242+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2769+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0610SB1668+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0622SB1668+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1050SB1668+SB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3304+SB1668

Bill Comments

feedback