VA SB1668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; Sunday store hours; distiller commission. Requires the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority) to pay a distiller who operates a government store on the distiller's licensed premises a commission of not less than 20 percent of the retail price of any goods sold. The bill also allows certain government stores, as determined by the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Authority, to be open on Sundays for the sale of alcoholic beverages after 10:00 a.m. Finally, the bill grants the Board the power to employ or retain in-house legal counsel to advise or represent the Authority in hearings, controversies, or other matters involving the interests of the Authority. The bill provides, however, that upon request by the Board, the Attorney General shall provide legal services for the Authority in accordance with current law. This bill is identical to HB 1770.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; Sunday store hours, distiller commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811) | |
2019-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1668ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (79-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 19107298D-S1 |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-13 | House | Delegates: Knight, Peace, Aird |
2019-02-13 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Mason, Norment |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1668H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106534D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106534D-H1 |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104334D |