VA SB1642 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources: Subcommittee #2 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Cosmetics animal testing products; prohibition; penalty. Prohibits a cosmetics manufacturer from selling a cosmetic for which such manufacturer or a cosmetics supplier conducted or contracted for a cosmetics animal test, defined in the bill, with certain exceptions. The bill also authorizes any retailer found to be selling a cosmetic for which a cosmetics animal test was conducted to sell any remaining stock of such product for 180 days after learning that a cosmetics animal test was conducted for the product, but prohibits such retailer from restocking, purchasing, or acquiring any additional inventory of such cosmetic. The bill authorizes the attorney for the Commonwealth in the jurisdiction in which a violation occurs to bring a civil action in the appropriate circuit court for injunctive relief and subjects any cosmetics manufacturer who violates such prohibitions to a civil penalty of up to $5,000 and an additional $1,000 for each day the violation continues. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetics; animal testing prohibited, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-23SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2019-01-23SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2019-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104530D-E
2019-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1642E
2019-01-22SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-22SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-22SenateRead second time
2019-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 7-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104530D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326591(n/a)See Bill Text
326594(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback